Global Patent Index - EP 1034409 A1

EP 1034409 A1 2000-09-13 - COLD BOX FOR CRYOGENIC DISTILLING PLANT

Title (en)

COLD BOX FOR CRYOGENIC DISTILLING PLANT

Title (de)

KÜHLBOX FÜR KRYOGENISCHE REKTIFIKATIONSANLAGE

Title (fr)

BOITE FROIDE POUR UNITE DE DISTILLATION CRYOGENIQUE

Publication

EP 1034409 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98954540 A

Priority

  • FR 9802387 W
  • FR 9714378 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2771160A1] A cryogenic distillation unit has a column and heat exchanger combination (4 - 8) located within a double-walled chamber (2) provided with inter-wall solid insulation (17, 18). Preferred Unit: A solid bulk insulation (18) is located around and above the column and heat exchanger combination (4 - 8) and solid insulation (18) is positioned between the bottoms of the two walls (9, 13) to support the interior wall (9). The distillation column (4) and the heat exchanger (5) are supported by feet (19) which pass through the bottom (10) of the interior wall (9) and rest on the bottom (14) of the exterior wall (13). A shaft (24) passes through the double wall (9, 13) to provide access to auxiliary equipment of the distillation apparatus (4 - 8). The heat exchanger and any other equipment, operating at a temperature different from that of the distillation column, are wrapped with an insulating foil or strip. A dry inert gas is introduced into the chamber (2) and/or into the inter-wall space. Valves (29) are provided for limiting the internal pressure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/06 (2006.01); F25J 3/00 (2006.01); F25J 3/02 (2006.01); F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04872 (2013.01); F25J 3/04878 (2013.01); F25J 3/0489 (2013.01); F25J 3/04945 (2013.01); F25J 3/04987 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9926033A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2771160 A1 19990521; FR 2771160 B1 20000128; AR 018520 A1 20011128; AU 1161099 A 19990607; AU 749531 B2 20020627; BR 9812787 A 20001017; CA 2312022 A1 19990527; CN 100383484 C 20080423; CN 1282411 A 20010131; DE 69811269 D1 20030313; DE 69811269 T2 20031106; EP 1034409 A1 20000913; EP 1034409 B1 20030205; ID 26856 A 20010215; JP 2001525528 A 20011211; NO 20002532 A 20000627; NO 20002532 D0 20000516; TW 423980 B 20010301; US 6378331 B1 20020430; WO 9926033 A1 19990527

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131109

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69811269

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131109

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-05-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69811269 P 20030313

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB NL SE

2003-02-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030205

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010706

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB NL SE