Global Patent Index - EP 1034411 A1

EP 1034411 A1 2000-09-13 - PYRO-ACOUSTIC GENERATOR FOR PROTECTING SUBMARINES AND SURFACE SHIPS

Title (en)

PYRO-ACOUSTIC GENERATOR FOR PROTECTING SUBMARINES AND SURFACE SHIPS

Title (de)

GENERATOR ZUR PYROTECHNISCHEN ERZEUGUNG VON AKUSTISCHEN DRUCKWELLEN ZUM SCHUTZ VON SCHIFFEN UND UNTERSEEBOTEN

Title (fr)

GENERATEUR PYROACOUSTIQUE POUR LA PROTECTION DE SOUS-MARINS ET DE BATIMENTS DE SURFACE

Publication

EP 1034411 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98958287 A

Priority

  • FR 9802578 W
  • FR 9715144 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2771805A1] The invention concerns a pyro-acoustic device for protecting submarines and surface ships, characterised in that it comprises: a structure (240) for forming a controlled underwater positioning device; and a housing (100) linked with the positioning structure, said housing (100) containing: a plurality of payloads (110) each for generating an acoustic effect; and control means (125, 126; 140; 121) for initiating, according to a controlled sequence, said plurality of payloads (110).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/36; B63G 9/02; F41H 11/02; F42B 12/60; F42B 12/70; H04K 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63G 9/02 (2006.01); F41H 11/02 (2006.01); F42B 12/36 (2006.01); F42B 12/60 (2006.01); F42B 12/70 (2006.01); H04K 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04K 3/65 (2013.01); B63G 9/02 (2013.01); F41H 11/02 (2013.01); F42B 12/36 (2013.01); F42B 12/60 (2013.01); F42B 12/70 (2013.01); H04K 3/825 (2013.01); H04K 2203/12 (2013.01); H04K 2203/22 (2013.01); H04K 2203/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928699A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2771805 A1 19990604; FR 2771805 B1 20000218; AU 1438299 A 19990616; AU 737923 B2 20010906; CA 2312780 A1 19990610; DE 69813285 D1 20030515; DE 69813285 T2 20040401; EP 1034411 A1 20000913; EP 1034411 B1 20030409; US 6430108 B1 20020806; WO 9928699 A1 19990610; ZA 9810969 B 19990601

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081201

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071202

2008-08-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071211

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010716

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT SE