Global patent index - EP 1034416 A2

EP 1034416 A2 2000-09-13 - METHOD FOR EVALUATING THE MARCH OF PRESSURE IN A COMBUSTION CHAMBER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR EVALUATING THE MARCH OF PRESSURE IN A COMBUSTION CHAMBER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWERTUNG DES BRENNRAUMDRUCKVERLAUFS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'EVALUATION DE LA COURBE DE LA PRESSION DANS UNE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION

Publication

EP 1034416 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98958153 A

Priority

  • DE 9802809 W
  • DE 19741820 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19741820A1] Combustion chamber pressure variation in each cylinder (10-13) is recorded by sensors (14-17).- DETAILED DESCRIPTION - The pressure is used to determine at least one of the valve control periods, 'exhaust opened', 'exhaust closed', 'inlet opened', 'inlet closed', as a function of crankshaft angle, detected by a further sensor, from which the events characterizing the valve control periods are evaluated. When the expansion line of the pressure curve changes so that the variation of pressure gradient with increasing volume or increasing crankshaft angle changes sign, 'exhaust opened' is inferred

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01L 23/22; G01L 23/30; G01M 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01L 23/24 (2006.01); F01L 1/34 (2006.01); F02D 35/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); G01M 15/04 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/009 (2013.01); F01L 1/34 (2013.01); F02D 35/023 (2013.01); F01L 2201/00 (2013.01); F02D 13/0215 (2013.01); F02D 13/0261 (2013.01); F02D 2041/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915872A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19741820 A1 19990325; DE 19741820 B4 20090212; EP 1034416 A2 20000913; EP 1034416 B1 20020227; EP 1034416 B2 20070314; JP 2001517786 A 20011009; JP 4392987 B2 20100106; US 2001002587 A1 20010607; US 6276319 B2 20010821; WO 9915872 A2 19990401; WO 9915872 A3 19990603

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091005

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100922

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100922

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-09-21 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2007-06-20 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2007-03-14 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20070314

2007-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: IAV GMBH INGENIEURSGESELLSCHAFT AUTO UND VERKEHR

- Effective date: 20021125

2002-08-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803230

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-04

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010424

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB