Global patent index - EP 1034428 A1

EP 1034428 A1 2000-09-13 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DISINTEGRATING BIOLOGICAL CELLS FOR THE PURPOSE OF EXTRACTING AND ANALYZING CELL CONTENTS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DISINTEGRATING BIOLOGICAL CELLS FOR THE PURPOSE OF EXTRACTING AND ANALYZING CELL CONTENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFSCHLUSS BIOLOGISCHER ZELLEN ZUR EXTRAKTION UND ANALYSE DER ZELLINHALTE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DESINTEGRATION DE CELLULES BIOLOGIQUES EN VUE DE L'EXTRACTION ET DE L'ANALYSE DE LEUR CONTENU

Publication

EP 1034428 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98960997 A

Priority

  • DE 9802979 W
  • DE 19752961 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928742A1] Disclosed is a method and a device for disintegrating biological cells for the purpose of extracting and analyzing the cell contents, especially nucleic acids. The invention is characterized in that the cells are exposed to an electric field and in that before or after being exposed to the electric field, the cells a are brought into contact with substances supporting cell disintegration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/483; C12M 1/00; G01N 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/48 (2006.01); C12M 1/00 (2006.01); C12M 3/08 (2006.01); C12N 1/06 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/10 (2006.01); G01N 1/28 (2006.01); G01N 1/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 1/44 (2013.01); C12M 47/06 (2013.01); C12N 1/066 (2013.01); C12N 15/1003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928742A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928742 A1 19990610; CA 2311429 A1 19990610; DE 19752961 C1 19990715; EP 1034428 A1 20000913; IL 136194 D0 20010520; JP 2001525185 A 20011211

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031124

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GUETH, ACHIM

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VOHRER, UWE

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BERNHAGEN, JUERGEN

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ELKINE, BENTSIAN

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TOVAR, GUENTER

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KOELBLIN, RUEDIGER

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHUELE, ANDREAS

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VITZTHUM, FRANK

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GUETH, ACHIM

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VOHRER, UWE

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BERNHAGEN, JUERGEN

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ELKINE, BENTSIAN

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TOVAR, GUENTER

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KOELBLIN, RUEDIGER

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHUELE, ANDREAS

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VITZTHUM, FRANK

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE