Global Patent Index - EP 1034466 A2

EP 1034466 A2 2000-09-13 - ACTUATION DEVICE FOR PEDAL OPERATION OF MECHANICAL, PRESSURE ACTUATED, OR ELECTRIC DEVICES

Title (en)

ACTUATION DEVICE FOR PEDAL OPERATION OF MECHANICAL, PRESSURE ACTUATED, OR ELECTRIC DEVICES

Title (de)

BETÄTIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG ZUM PEDUELLEN BEDIENEN VON MECHANISCHEN, DRUCKMITTELBETÄTIGTEN ODER ELEKTRISCHEN EINRICHTUNGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT POUR COMMANDER AU PIED DES DISPOSITIFS MECANIQUES, ACTIONNES PAR UN FLUIDE SOUS PRESSION OU ELECTRIQUES

Publication

EP 1034466 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98965199 A

Priority

  • DE 19752928 A
  • EP 9807713 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928803A2] The invention relates to an actuation device for pedal operation of mechanical, pressure actuated, or electric devices having a two-dimensional actuation element (70) which can be adjusted in a plurality of directions from a starting position into an actuation position in which the actuation element operates a switch element (50, 52).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 13/02 (2006.01); G05G 1/30 (2008.04)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 13/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928803A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928803 A2 19990610; WO 9928803 A3 19990812; AR 013781 A1 20010110; DE 19752928 C1 19990923; EP 1034466 A2 20000913; EP 1034466 B1 20030528; KR 20010024646 A 20010326; TW 480170 B 20020321

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MAQUET G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20051130

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-08-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-12-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2004-11-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041119

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-06-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE FR GB IT SE

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAQUET GMBH & CO. KG

2001-05-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE FR GB IT SE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE FR GB IT SE