Global patent index - EP 1034528 A1

EP 1034528 A1 2000-09-13 - PUBLIC DISPLAY DEVICE

Title (en)

PUBLIC DISPLAY DEVICE

Title (de)

OFFENTLICHE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE PUBLIC

Publication

EP 1034528 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98955730 A

Priority

  • FR 9802508 W
  • FR 9714923 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2771538A1] The display panel has an external enclosure (2) which has a transparent wall (3). The enclosure houses a continuous sheet (4) which carries a number of messages. The sheet is wound on two rollers (11,12) and runs over guide rollers (13) in the corners of the enclosure. A drive mechanism operates on the two principal rollers to position the sheet so that the selected message is displayed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 11/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/29 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928891A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2771538 A1 19990528; FR 2771538 B1 20011207; AU 1246599 A 19990616; DE 69806410 D1 20020808; DE 69806410 T2 20030403; EP 1034528 A1 20000913; EP 1034528 B1 20020703; JP 2001525562 A 20011211; US 6557281 B1 20030506; WO 9928891 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151124

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20151124

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69806410

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-09-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020820

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69806410

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-08

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-07-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011122

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT