Global Patent Index - EP 1034552 A1

EP 1034552 A1 2000-09-13 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO THERMALLY-RESPONSIVE ACTUATORS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO THERMALLY-RESPONSIVE ACTUATORS

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN AN THERMISCH ANSPRECHENDE AUSLÖSER

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A DES ACTIONNEURS A SENSIBILITE THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 1034552 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98956996 A

Priority

  • GB 9803571 W
  • GB 9725401 A
  • GB 9811400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928935A1] A steam sensor switch for an automatic kettle employs a snap-acting bimetallic actuator to operate an overcentre arrangement by means of a push rod, the overcentre arrangement comprising a C-spring and a trip lever sprung between spaced-apart abutments. Whereas in prior arrangements of this type the trip lever has been arranged to interact with cantilevered spring contact elements which are mechanically deformed in switch operations, in the steam sensor of the invention the spring contact elements are integrally formed with the C-spring so that they pivot about a fulcrum when the overcentre arrangement switches between its two stable conditions and are not subject to mechanical deformation. This contact arrangement, which makes use of an E-shaped spring having the C-spring as the middle one of its three horizontal strokes, enables greater contact separation to be achieved in a small size switch than does the conventional cantilevered arrangement and thereby enhances electrical safety.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 5/18; H01H 37/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 5/18 (2006.01); H01H 5/22 (2006.01); H01H 5/24 (2006.01); H01H 37/04 (2006.01); H01H 37/54 (2006.01); H01H 37/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 5/22 (2013.01); H01H 5/18 (2013.01); H01H 5/24 (2013.01); H01H 37/043 (2013.01); H01H 37/54 (2013.01); H01H 37/60 (2013.01); H01H 2037/5472 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9928935A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928935 A1 19990610; AU 1342799 A 19990616; CN 1132206 C 20031224; CN 1286798 A 20010307; DE 69810963 D1 20030227; DE 69810963 T2 20030605; EP 1034552 A1 20000913; EP 1034552 B1 20030122; GB 0121868 D0 20011031; GB 2363908 A 20020109; GB 2363908 B 20020306

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69810963

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810963 P 20030227

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2002-10-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB