Global Patent Index - EP 1034553 A1

EP 1034553 A1 2000-09-13 - CIRCUIT FOR MONITORING AN ALTERNATIVE CURRENT POWER SWITCH

Title (en)

CIRCUIT FOR MONITORING AN ALTERNATIVE CURRENT POWER SWITCH

Title (de)

SCHALTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES WECHSELSTROMSCHALTERS

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT DE SURVEILLANCE D'UN COMMUTATEUR A COURANT ALTERNATIF

Publication

EP 1034553 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98961142 A

Priority

  • EP 98961142 A
  • EP 9807086 W
  • EP 97120590 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0920038A1] The circuit uses a digital component output signal associated with one input to determine whether switch is closed and diode and resistor intact or switch is open. The switch (2) has one connection to one voltage phase (P) and another to the circuit input (4). The input is connected via a diode (9) and first resistor (10) to a high impedance input of a first digital component (12). The high impedance input of the digital component is connected via a second resistor (13) to the output of a second digital component (15), whose output, after a delay, is either connected to the null point (N) of the mains voltage or outputs a voltage greater than the threshold level for the first digital component's input. The signal on the output associated with one input is used to determine whether the switch is closed and the diode and second resistor intact or the switch is open.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/54 (2006.01); H01H 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/167 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927552A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0920038 A1 19990602; CN 1139950 C 20040225; CN 1279820 A 20010110; DE 59803231 D1 20020404; EP 1034553 A1 20000913; EP 1034553 B1 20020227; JP 2002501279 A 20020115; JP 4063494 B2 20080319; PL 191165 B1 20060331; PL 340697 A1 20010226; RU 2196370 C2 20030110; US 6486647 B1 20021126; WO 9927552 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161106

2017-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161107

2017-08-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161106

2017-07-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-07-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803231

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151105

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151109

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150209

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-11-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Effective date: 20131029

2013-11-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Effective date: 20131029

2013-07-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130620 AND 20130626

2013-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG, ZUG, CH

- Document: DE 59803231

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-02-15 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG, CH

2013-01-31 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG, CH

2003-02-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803231 20020404

2002-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE