Global Patent Index - EP 1034580 A1

EP 1034580 A1 2000-09-13 - GROUND ROD WITH BOND PLUG AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE BOND PLUG

Title (en)

GROUND ROD WITH BOND PLUG AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE BOND PLUG

Title (de)

ERDUNGSSTANGE MIT KLEMMANSCHLUSS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER KLEMME

Title (fr)

PIQUET DE PRISE DE TERRE AVEC COSSE DE CONNEXION ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE LA COSSE

Publication

EP 1034580 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98955732 A

Priority

  • FR 9802512 W
  • FR 9714788 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2771553A1] The earth stake is cut from a length of commercial right angled steel (2) tapered at one end (4) to provide a sharp spike. The terminal (5) is folded in a squared U-shape from a flat sheet of steel. Two suitably sized right angle triangles are cut to allow the terminal to slot over the stake. A bolt (13) screws through the center of the U to clamp the collar and the earthing wire (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/66; H01R 43/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/36 (2006.01); H01R 4/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/36 (2013.01); H01R 4/66 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927613A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2771553 A1 19990528; FR 2771553 B1 20000407; AT 215751 T 20020415; DE 69804662 D1 20020508; EP 1034580 A1 20000913; EP 1034580 B1 20020403; HU 0100254 A2 20010528; HU 0100254 A3 20010628; NO 20002660 A 20000718; NO 20002660 D0 20000524; PL 340700 A1 20010226; SK 7862000 A3 20001211; WO 9927613 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ETS *FRENEHARD ET MICHAUX S.A.

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-12-11 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1034580E

2002-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021124

2002-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-07-04 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-07-03 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-05-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804662 20020508

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000626;SI PAYMENT 20000626

2002-04-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215751 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010405

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000626;SI PAYMENT 20000626