Global Patent Index - EP 1034582 A2

EP 1034582 A2 2000-09-13 - CONNECTOR AND METHOD OF CONNECTION

Title (en)

CONNECTOR AND METHOD OF CONNECTION

Title (de)

VERBINDER UND VERBINDUNGSMETHODE

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR ET PROCEDE DE CONNEXION

Publication

EP 1034582 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98955762 A

Priority

  • GB 9803499 W
  • GB 9724798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2331683A] The present invention provides a method of coupling a telecommunications signal to a plurality of power cables (15), each cable being connected in a line to a bus-bar (11-13) the method including the steps of selecting one of the cables located substantially in the centre of the line and either coupling the telecommunications signal to the selected cable or coupling the signal to the bus-bar in the vicinity of the selected cable. By "in the vicinity" is preferably meant at or near the selected cable e.g. nearer to the selected cable than to any of the other cables connected to the bus-bar. Where a telecommunications signal is to be connected to a plurality of power cables, one aim is usually to ensure a roughly equal distribution of telecommunications signal power among the power cables. By making the physical connection in the vicinity of one of the central cables in the line, as proposed above, this helps to ensure that the signal power is approximately distributed in as equal away as possible. A fuse holder modified to include a telecommunications signal connector is also disclosed (figs. 2-5 not shown).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 11/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/00 (2006.01); H01H 85/20 (2006.01); H01H 85/46 (2006.01); H02B 1/20 (2006.01); H04B 3/54 (2006.01); H04B 3/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 3/56 (2013.01); H04B 2203/5425 (2013.01); H04B 2203/5445 (2013.01); H04B 2203/5466 (2013.01); H04B 2203/5483 (2013.01); H04B 2203/5487 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927614A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2331683 A9; GB 2331683 A 19990526; GB 2331683 B 20010718; GB 9825748 D0 19990120; AU 1249199 A 19990615; AU 741718 B2 20011206; CA 2311551 A1 19990603; EP 1034582 A2 20000913; GB 9724798 D0 19980121; HK 1018369 A1 20020328; JP 2001524741 A 20011204; WO 9927614 A2 19990603; WO 9927614 A3 19990819; ZA 9810728 B 20000508

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032299

2004-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030903

2002-04-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF CONNECTION

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE