Global Patent Index - EP 1034591 A1

EP 1034591 A1 2000-09-13 - ARCING FAULT PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR A SWITCHGEAR ENCLOSURE

Title (en)

ARCING FAULT PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR A SWITCHGEAR ENCLOSURE

Title (de)

LICHTBOGENFEHLERSCHUTZ FÜR EINE SCHALTANLAGE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES ARCS DE RUPTURE POUR ARMOIRE ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1034591 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98958579 A

Priority

  • US 9824289 W
  • US 97425497 A
  • US 19009498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9926328A1] An arching fault protection system for a switchgear enclosure (10) includes a switching device (32) for rapidly diverting current from the source bus (22) of an electrical distribution system (12) in response to the detection of arcing faults in the system. The switching device (32), which may comprise a mechanical switch, a solid-state switch or hybrid device, quickly diverts current carried on the source bus (22) to effectively extinguish arcing fault currents present in the distribution system (12), preventing the generation of gases at high pressures and/or temperatures so as to protect the switchgear equipment from damage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02H 7/00; H01H 33/26; H01H 79/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/666 (2006.01); H01H 33/26 (2006.01); H01H 79/00 (2006.01); H02H 1/00 (2006.01); H01H 33/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/26 (2013.01); H01H 79/00 (2013.01); H01H 33/666 (2013.01); H02H 1/0023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9926328 A1 19990527; AU 1459399 A 19990607; CA 2310619 A1 19990527; CA 2310619 C 20050208; EP 1034591 A1 20000913; EP 1034591 A4 20040310

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-01-20 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20151222

2016-01-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.

2014-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01H 79/00 20060101ALI20131220BHEP

2014-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01H 33/26 20060101ALI20131220BHEP

2014-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02H 1/00 20060101ALI20131220BHEP

2014-01-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01H 33/666 20060101AFI20131220BHEP

2012-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.

2007-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070612

2004-03-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 02H 7/00 A

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01H 79/00 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01H 33/26 B

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB