Global Patent Index - EP 1034715 A2

EP 1034715 A2 2000-09-13 - Device for binding bundles of products

Title (en)

Device for binding bundles of products

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Umbinden von gebündelten Waren

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour lier des produits en faisceau

Publication

EP 1034715 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104035 A

Priority

AT 14799 U

Abstract (en)

The device comprises a rubber elastic band or belt (1) with a tab (2) at one end whose outer surface forms part of a touch and close fastener. The tab has a crosswise slit (5) forming the eyelet through which the end of the band can be passed. A grip tab (7) at the free end of the band has on one side the other part (8) of the touch and close fastener. the grip tab can be wider than the band and the slit forming the eyelet

Abstract (de)

Die Einrichtung dient zum Umbinden von gebündelten Waren. Sie besteht aus einem Band (1) mit einem ersten Ende, an dem eine Öse vorgesehen ist, und mit einem zweiten Ende, das durch die Öse hindurchgeführt ist. Das durch die Öse durchgeführte Ende ist gegen das Band (1) legbar und am Band festlegbar. Das Band (1) ist als gummielastisches Band ausgebildet. Am einen Ende des gummielastischen Bandes (1) ist eine Lasche (2) befestigt, deren zumindest äußere Oberfläche als Teil eines Haft- oder Klettverschlusses ausgebildet ist. Die Lasche (2) weist einen quer zur Längserstreckung des Bandes (1) verlaufenden, der Durchführung des einen Endes (6) des Bandes (1) dienenden Schlitz (5) als Öse auf. Am freien Ende des Bandes (1) ist eine Grifflasche (7) angeordnet, deren zumindest eine Seite als anderer Teil (8) des Haft- oder Klettverschlusses ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 18/00; B65D 63/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 18/00 (2006.01); B65D 63/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 18/00 (2013.01); B65D 63/10 (2013.01); B65D 2313/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034715 A2 20000913; EP 1034715 A3 20001018; AT 3648 U1 20000626

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-04-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI