Global Patent Index - EP 1034766 A2

EP 1034766 A2 2000-09-13 - Wheelchair

Title (en)

Wheelchair

Title (de)

Rollstuhl

Title (fr)

Fauteuil roulant

Publication

EP 1034766 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00103525 A

Priority

GB 9905658 A

Abstract (en)

A wheelchair is described having a frame (10) and two axle assemblies (12), one for mounting each of two drive wheels to the frame by means of their associated axle. Each of the axle assemblies comprises a frame portion (14) including an axle block (18); means for connecting the frame portion (14) to the frame in a plurality of positions; and means for securing a drive wheel axle to the axle block (18). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/10 (2013.01); A61G 5/1097 (2016.11)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9619961 A1 19960704 - NO LIMIT DESIGNS INC [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034766 A2 20000913; EP 1034766 A3 20020123; GB 2347655 A 20000913; GB 9905658 D0 19990505; NO 20001235 A 20000913; NO 20001235 D0 20000309

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-11-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI