Global patent index - EP 1034767 A2

EP 1034767 A2 2000-09-13 - Mattress arrangement

Title (en)

Mattress arrangement

Title (de)

Matratzenanordnung

Title (fr)

Arrangement de matelas

Publication

EP 1034767 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00301995 A

Priority

GB 9905507 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention concerns a mattress arrangement comprising an upper layer 2 and a lower layer 3. The lower layer comprises a plurality of discrete elongate portions 4 extending longitudinally of the mattress arrangement, the elongate portions being detachably fastenable together, wherein one or more of the elongate portions is foldable upon itself. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/057; A61G 7/065

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/057 (2006.01); A61G 7/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/05715 (2013.01); A61G 7/07 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 2311217 A 19970924 - WELCH ROBERT JOHN DUDLEY [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034767 A2 20000913; EP 1034767 A3 20020206; GB 0005865 D0 20000503; GB 2347854 A 20000920; GB 2347854 B 20030514; GB 9905507 D0 19990505

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041001

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2002-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI