Global Patent Index - EP 1034770 A3

EP 1034770 A3 2000-11-22 - Massage device to be inserted in the back of a massage chair or the like, having a more efficient vertical massage

Title (en)

Massage device to be inserted in the back of a massage chair or the like, having a more efficient vertical massage

Title (de)

Massagevorrichtung zum Einbau in den Rücken eines Massagesessels oder dergleichen, mit verbesserter vertikaler Massage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de massage à insérer dans le dossier d'un fauteuil de massage ou similaire, pourvu de massage vertical amélioré

Publication

EP 1034770 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00102123 A

Priority

IT MI990519 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1034770A2] A massage device to be inserted in the back of a massage chair or the like, comprising a threaded shaft (8) along which a carriage (3) can slide, the carriage (3) being adapted to support a plurality of massage wheels (4) and being actuated along the threaded shaft (8) by a gearmotor (6), and a vibration device (10) which is rigidly coupled to the carriage (3) and is adapted to transmit vibrations to the massage wheels (4) in order to move the massage wheels (4) transversely with respect to the threaded shaft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 15/00; A61H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 23/02 (2006.01); A61H 15/00 (2006.01); A61H 1/00 (2006.01); A61H 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 15/0078 (2013.01); A61H 23/02 (2013.01); A61H 2201/0138 (2013.01); A61H 2201/0142 (2013.01); A61H 2201/0149 (2013.01); A61H 2201/1669 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034770 A2 20000913; EP 1034770 A3 20001122; IT 1311901 B1 20020320; IT MI990519 A1 20000912; JP 2000262577 A 20000926

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020710

2002-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CIAR S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT ES

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61H 15/00 A, 7A 61H 1/00 B

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT ES

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI