Global Patent Index - EP 1034814 A1

EP 1034814 A1 2000-09-13 - Safety device for work at heights

Title (en)

Safety device for work at heights

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung für Arbeit in der Höhe

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité pour travail en hauteur

Publication

EP 1034814 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400685 A

Priority

FR 9902953 A

Abstract (en)

Safety mechanism (1) has reel body (2) with two lateral walls (3) and surrounding wall (4) defining internal chamber (5). Reel drum (7), for strap (8) passing through slot (13) in reel body, rotates around horizontal axis (6) placed in chamber. Strap is partially winded around return roll (14), rotating around axis in reel body, and is vertical (or nearly) between reel drum and return roll.

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif de sécurité (1) pour travail en hauteur avec sangle (8) enroulée sur un tambour (7) interne sollicité dans le sens de l'enroulement par un organe élastique, est remarquable notamment en ce que : l'ouverture (13) de passage de la sangle (8) est ménagée dans l'un des pans verticaux de la paroi enveloppe (4) du corps d'enrouleur (2), la sangle (8) dans le corps (2), entre le tambour (7) et l'ouverture de passage (13) s'enroule partiellement sur au moins un rouleau de renvoi (14) monté librement on rotation dans le corps (2) autour d'un axe horizontal s'étendant entre les deux parois latérales (3), la sangle (8) entre le tambour (7) et le rouleau de renvoi (14) est verticale ou quasi verticale, ledit dispositif (1) est monté on pivotement autour d'un axe vertical. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 35/0093 (2013.01); A62B 35/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034814 A1 20000913; FR 2790672 A1 20000915; FR 2790672 B1 20010608

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050404

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: P.M.T.L. SAS

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI