Global Patent Index - EP 1034844 A2

EP 1034844 A2 2000-09-13 - Spraying lance for applying paste-like substances

Title (en)

Spraying lance for applying paste-like substances

Title (de)

Spritzlanze zum Auftragen von pastösen Medien

Title (fr)

Lance de pulvérisation pour l'application de substances pâteuses

Publication

EP 1034844 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103557 A

Priority

DE 19909759 A

Abstract (en)

The spray lance (1), to apply a paste medium, has a shut-off unit (3) in a housing (2) operated by a lever (4) with limited rotation. A holder (12) in the spray lance (1) contains an inserted switch (13), linked to the feed pump (7). The shut-off unit (3) also has a switch ring (11) with a switch lug (11) which works with the switch (13) without contact. When the shut-off unit (3) is open, the switch ring (11) has a separate and restricted rotation against it, and is locked in the closed position.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Spritzlanze (1) zum Auftragen von pastösen Medien, mit einem in einem Gehäuse (2) angeordneten Absperrorgan (3), das begrenzt verdrehbar gelagert und mittels eines Hebels (4) betätigbar ist, ist in einem an der Spritzlanze (1) angebrachten Halter (12) ein Schaltglied (13) eingesetzt, das mit ener Förderpumpe (7) verbunden ist. Des weiteren weist das Absperrorgan (3) einen Schaltring (11) auf, der mit einer mit dem Schaltglied (13) berührungslos zusammenwirkenden Schaltfahne (14) versehen ist. Außerdem ist der Schaltring (11) bei geöffnetem Absperrorgan (3) gegenüber diesem getrennt begrenzt verdrehbar und in dessen Schließstellung verriegelt. Durch diese Ausgestaltung ist gewährleistet, daß bei Stillstand der Förderpumpe (7) in deren Förderleitung (6) kein Druck herrscht, die Förderleitung (6) wird vielmehr zwangsläufig druckentlastet. Dadurch wird die Unfallgefahr gemindert und sichergestellt, daß der Antriebsmotor der Förderpumpe (7), ohne einen Gegendruck überwinden zu müssen, in Betrieb genommen werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/30; B05B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/30 (2006.01); B05B 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 12/00 (2013.01); B05B 1/3026 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909759 C1 20000907; EP 1034844 A2 20000913; EP 1034844 A3 20021016

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030417

2003-08-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 05B 1/30 A, 7B 05B 9/00 B, 7B 05B 12/00 B

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI