Global Patent Index - EP 1034853 A2

EP 1034853 A2 2000-09-13 - Cold pilger rolling tool for the manufacture of internally ribbed pipes

Title (en)

Cold pilger rolling tool for the manufacture of internally ribbed pipes

Title (de)

Kaltpilgerwalzwerkzeug zum Herstellen von innenverrippten Rohren

Title (fr)

Outil de laminage à froid, à pas de pèlerin, pour la fabrication de tubes nervurés

Publication

EP 1034853 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250047 A

Priority

DE 19911677 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19911677C1] The mandrel (1) has, on its free end, an elongating plug (4) able to rotate coaxially with the mandrel. The negative of the helical internal ribbing to be created is incorporated in this plug. The external diameter of the plug is a maximum 50% of the ribbing depth greater than the internal diameter of the plain ended pipe.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Kaltpilgerwerkzeug zur Herstellung von innenverrippten Rohren nach dem Kaltpilgerschrittverfahren in einem in Walzrichtung hin- und herbewegbaren Walzgerüst mit verjüngend kalibrierten Walzen, die mit wechselndem Drehsinn über dem Walzgut abrollen, in dem sich ein ebenfalls verjüngender Kaltpilgerdorn befindet. Dabei weist der Kaltpilgerdorn (1) an seinem freien Ende einen koaxial drehbar gelagerten Verlängerungsstopfen (4) auf, in den das Negativ der herzustellenden gewendelten Innenverrippung eingearbeitet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 25/00 (2006.01); B21B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 25/00 (2013.01); B21B 21/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19911677 C1 20000504; EP 1034853 A2 20000913; EP 1034853 A3 20031001; US 6205833 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040406

2004-06-23 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

2004-04-28 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040227

2003-12-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KALKENINGS, PETER, DIPL.-ING.

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI