Global patent index - EP 1034861 A2

EP 1034861 A2 2000-09-13 - Machine for cutting and press-forming material fed in the form of wire

Title (en)

Machine for cutting and press-forming material fed in the form of wire

Title (de)

Maschine zum Schneiden und Formen von Draht

Title (fr)

Machine de coupage et formage de fil

Publication

EP 1034861 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00104456 A

Priority

  • EP 00104456 A
  • EP 99103978 A

Abstract (en)

A machine (1) for cutting and press-forming material fed in the form of wire, which comprises a supporting structure (2) which supports elements (24,25) for intermittently feeding material in the form of wire (60) in an advancement direction. The supporting structure (2) supports, so as to allow sliding in a first sliding direction which is substantially parallel to the advancement direction, a first assembly (3) which is provided with a holder (4) for at least one punch which faces a forming die. Elements for cutting the material in the form of wire fed by the feeder into segments of preset length are arranged between the forming die and the at least one punch. Actuators are provided for actuating the first assembly (3) with a reciprocating motion along the first sliding direction with respect to the supporting structure (2). The feeder comprises at least one pair of counter-rotating rollers (24,25) which are arranged within the dimensions of the first assembly (3) in a direction which is parallel to the first sliding direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 23/00; B21F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 1/00 (2006.01); B21F 11/00 (2006.01); B21F 23/00 (2006.01); B21K 1/58 (2006.01); B21K 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21K 1/58 (2013.01); B21F 1/00 (2013.01); B21F 11/00 (2013.01); B21F 23/00 (2013.01); B21K 27/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034861 A2 20000913; EP 1034861 A3 20010919

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-10 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020424

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI