Global Patent Index - EP 1034862 A1

EP 1034862 A1 2000-09-13 - Continuous casting plant for billet, bloom and slab inclusive cutting and deburring device with improved service for save and quick production of shortest and burr-free parts

Title (en)

Continuous casting plant for billet, bloom and slab inclusive cutting and deburring device with improved service for save and quick production of shortest and burr-free parts

Title (de)

Stahlstranggiessanlage für Knüppel, Blöcke und Brammen mit einer im direkten oder späteren Produktfluss angeordneten Unterteil- und Entbartungsanlage zum sicheren, wartungsgünstigen und schnellen Erzeugen kürzester und gratfreier Werkstücke

Title (fr)

Installation de coulée continue de billette, de lingot et de brame avec un dispositif de decoupage et d'ebavourage avec une durée de vie améliorée pour produire des pièces plus courte et sans bavures

Publication

EP 1034862 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99104562 A

Priority

EP 99104562 A

Abstract (en)

A continuous casting machine, comprising a strand flame cutting and deburring unit driven between water-cooled tracks (3) on a wheeled frame (4), is new. A continuous casting machine has a cast strand underside cutting and deburring unit with one or more flame cutting machines (1) driven by push or pull chains or rack and pinion mechanisms between upper and lower water-cooled tracks (3), which can be offset sideways, on a profiled machine frame (4) with lower and upper drive and guide wheels (5). The frame includes a saddle which can be displaced perpendicular and transverse to the cast strand (2) by clamps (7) and which is height adjustable by means of a hydraulic or pneumatic motor, the clamp comprising a slide positioned on the lower track (3) or a clamping lever pair (7) driven synchronously by a vertically operating cylinder. The saddle is fitted with one or two cutter drives which provide pendulum-like or parallel vertical or horizontal cutting, cutting torches (9) which can be raised for nozzle exchange and a pneumatically driven deburring unit for the cut workpiece underside edge. Apart from the cutting torches (9), their holders and their torch arms or edge probes, no part of the cutting machine projects below the lower water-cooled track (3).

Abstract (de)

Eine für Knüppel-, Block-, Brammen- oder Dünnbrammen gedachte Strangbrennschneidmaschine (1) in einem übereinander angeordneten Schienenpaar (3) mit neuartiger Wärmeschutzplatte (6) und ohne ungekühlte Maschinenteile unter den Schienen (3), die sich als Anklemmausführung seitlich mit einem wandernden Werkstück bewegt, mit einer Aufsetzkufe (10) verschiedene Werkstückdicken abdeckt und mit sogenannten Schubschneidstangen (24) auch zum Gegeneinanderschneiden mit zwei Brennern (9) eingesetzt werden kann. Ein neues Brenner- oder Schneiddüsen-Schnellwechselsystem verbessert Einsatz und Wartung. Schneidsicherheit und Schnittqualität werden durch eine brennernahe die Drücke und die Massenströme regelnde Gasesteuerung verbessert. Ein neuartiger Rollenentbarter (32) zum Entbarten gerade brenngeschnittener Strangteile nach der Brennschneidmaschine (1) erlaubt das hin- und hergehende Entbarten und den Transport besonders kurzer Stücke über die Entbarterlücke. Beim Entbarten weiter hinter den Brennschneidmaschinen (1) werden auf einem gemeinsamen Rollgang ankommende, nicht absolut gerade, das heißt hoch und abwärts gebogene Strangstücke (2) in einem anhebenden und mit Vorstoß versehenen Entbarter mit Entbartungswalze ermöglicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/126

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/126 (2006.01); B23K 7/00 (2006.01); B23K 7/10 (2006.01); B23K 103/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/1265 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034862 A1 20000913; ES 2150895 T1 20001216; JP 2000288702 A 20001017; US 6277322 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030130

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010210

2000-12-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150895 T1

2000-11-17 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2000-10-25 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI