Global Patent Index - EP 1034863 A1

EP 1034863 A1 2000-09-13 - Method for die casting of light metals

Title (en)

Method for die casting of light metals

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Druckgiessen von Leichtmetallen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la coulée sous pression de métaux légers

Publication

EP 1034863 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810195 A

Priority

EP 99810195 A

Abstract (en)

A pressure die casting process, comprising oxygen flushing the pre-evacuated die cavity (14) and re-evacuating prior to molten metal injection, is new. An Independent claim is also included for a die cast aluminum (alloy) part produced by the above process and containing less than 1 cm<3> included gas per 100 g aluminum.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Druckgiessen von Aluminium und Aluminiumlegierungen wird das flüssige Metall (20) in eine Füllkammer (16) eingefüllt und mittels eines Kolbens (24) aus der Füllkammer (16) in einen Formhohlraum (14) eingeschossen. Der Formhohlraum (14) wird vorevakuiert, nach dem Vorevakuieren mit Sauerstoff geflutet und nach dem Fluten mit Sauerstoff und vor dem Einschiessen des flüssigen Metalls (20) erneut evakuiert. Anschliessend wird das flüssige Metall (20) in den Formhohlraum (14) eingeschossen. Mit dem Verfahren können Druckgussteile mit geringer Neigung zu Poren- und Blasenbildung hergestellt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 3382910 A 19680514 - RADTKE SCHRADE F, et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 033 (M - 003) 21 March 1980 (1980-03-21)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 074 (M - 203) 26 March 1983 (1983-03-26)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 8532, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M22, AN 85-195087, XP002110421

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034863 A1 20000913; BR 0000718 A 20010116; CA 2299078 A1 20000905; US 6308766 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030708

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021015

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010313

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI