Global Patent Index - EP 1034871 A2

EP 1034871 A2 2000-09-13 - Bandsaw blade having set teeth and exhibiting reduced lateral force

Title (en)

Bandsaw blade having set teeth and exhibiting reduced lateral force

Title (de)

Bandsägeblatt mit geschränkten Zähnen und mit reduzierten seitlichen Kräften

Title (fr)

Lame de scie à ruban à dents avoyées et à forces latérales réduites

Publication

EP 1034871 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00850040 A

Priority

US 26585199 A

Abstract (en)

A bandsaw blade (10) includes set teeth (14,16) each having a side relief angle (16) and a lateral rake angle (18). The side relief angle (16) should be positive for all metal cutting; for cutting in tough deformation-hardening materials the angel (16) should be at least 15 degrees, to avoid a hardening of the cut surfaces and to keep cutting forces low. This can normally be achieved by letting the hammer of the setting machine strike the tooth only near the rake face (20) and near the top (tip) T of the tooth, which thereby causes the tooth to twist during setting. The lateral rake angle (18) near the tip of the tooth is between 5 and 10 degrees negative to minimize the size of lateral forces during cutting. According to the invention, the side clearance angle (16) and the lateral rake angle (18) of the set teeth can be chosen independently of one another by performing a grinding operation on the front rake force (20) of a blank (10B) prior to the setting operation. That is, as shown in Figs. 2 and 3, at least the upper part of the front rake face (20) is ground at an acute angle (22) relative to a transverse line L extending perpendicular to a centerline CL. The angle (22) corresponds to the desired difference between the side clearance angle (16) and the lateral rake angle (18). The angle (22) is preferably at least 5 degrees. In accordance with the invention, the side relief angle can be made large enough to keep the cutting forces low and avoid a hardening of the cut surfaces, while the lateral rake angle can be made low enough to minimize lateral forces generated during cutting. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23D 61/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 33/06 (2006.01); B23D 61/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23D 61/121 (2013.01); Y10T 83/9317 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9319 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034871 A2 20000913; EP 1034871 A3 20021002; JP 2000280201 A 20001010; US 2001015120 A1 20010823

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI