Global patent index - EP 1034882 A2

EP 1034882 A2 2000-09-13 - An apparatus for edge grinding plate-like articles in a vertical stack, e.g. laminboards

Title (en)

An apparatus for edge grinding plate-like articles in a vertical stack, e.g. laminboards

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Randschleifen von Flachartikeln in Stapeln, z.B. Laminatplatten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le meulage des bords d'articles plats empilés verticalement, p.e. des plaques laminées

Publication

EP 1034882 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00104873 A

Priority

DK 34899 A

Abstract (en)

There is described an apparatus (2) for edge grinding of plate-like items, e.g. laminboards, e.g. laminboards, comprising a carrying transom (4) displaceable in the longitudinal direction, a trolley (12) with a turning ring (14) which is displaceable transversely thereto, a roller conveyor (6) for stacks (8) of plate-like items, a fixing device along the roller conveyor (6) for the said item stacks (8), and a programmable, preferably combined electronic and pneumatic, control system, which apparatus comprises a number of vertical carrying beams (16) suspended by the turning ring (14), and which are mutually connected by means of a number of horizontal bushing pipes (18) in which there are mounted sliding rod guides (20) for two vertical shafts (22) on which there is mounted large number of grinding means rollers forming vertical grinding cylinders (24) that preferably have greater length than height in comparison with the said item stacks (8), and which are connected with each their driving motor, e.g. via driving belt wheels and driving belts, so that said grinding cylinders (24) may rotate with each their direction of rotation. In a simple way it hereby becomes possible to mechanize the very heavy and work environment detrimental work connected with edge grinding of plate-like items, e.g. stacked laminboards, which apparatus in addition makes possible to optimise the grinding work itself. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/02 (2006.01); B24B 9/18 (2006.01); B24B 51/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/02 (2013.01); B24B 9/18 (2013.01); B24B 51/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034882 A2 20000913; EP 1034882 A3 20020710

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021001

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 24B 9/02 A, 7B 24B 9/18 B

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI