Global Patent Index - EP 1034889 A3

EP 1034889 A3 2000-12-20 - Method and device for blasting with a blasting medium at a reduced temperature

Title (en)

Method and device for blasting with a blasting medium at a reduced temperature

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bestrahlen mit Strahlmittel unter Kühlung

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de grenaillage avec des particules refroidies

Publication

EP 1034889 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00104374 A

Priority

DE 19909719 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10010010A1] The method and equipment for exposing a workpiece to blasting media (3) in solid aggregate form under normal conditions involve a blasting plant (1) with injectors for adding the blasting medium to a jet of carrier gas (2,5). A tube (7) leads from the blasting plant to a blasting appliance (4) from which the blasting medium is applied to the workpiece being treated. The jet of carrier gas is cooled by adding liquefied gases (6) conveyed in a pipe (8) to a part-jet in the form of a bypass (5) of the jet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24C 1/00; B24C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24C 1/00 (2006.01); B24C 3/00 (2006.01); B24C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24C 1/00 (2013.01); B24C 3/00 (2013.01); B24C 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10010010 A1 20000907; EP 1034889 A2 20000913; EP 1034889 A3 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AG

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010613

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 24C 1/00 A, 7B 24C 7/00 B

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE GAS AG

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI