Global Patent Index - EP 1034890 A3

EP 1034890 A3 2000-12-20 - Method and device for blasting with different types of blasting medium

Title (en)

Method and device for blasting with different types of blasting medium

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bestrahlen mit verschiedenartigen Strahlmitteln

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de grenaillage avec différents types de grenailles

Publication

EP 1034890 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00104375 A

Priority

DE 19909718 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10010012A1] The method and appliance for exposing a workpiece to blasting media in solid aggregate form comprise at least one plant (1) . At least one gas jet (2) contains the blasting medium (3,4). One or more tubes (6,7) lead from the plant to a blasting member (5) from which the blasting medium is applied to the workpiece being treated. The blasting media include first media under normal conditions in gaseous or liquid aggregate form, and second media under normal conditions in solid aggregate form.

[origin: DE10010012A1] The method and appliance for exposing a workpiece to blasting media in solid aggregate form comprise at least one plant (1) . At least one gas jet (2) contains the blasting medium (3,4). One or more tubes (6,7) lead from the plant to a blasting member (5) from which the blasting medium is applied to the workpiece being treated. The blasting media include first media under normal conditions in gaseous or liquid aggregate form, and second media under normal conditions in solid aggregate form.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24C 1/00; B24C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24C 1/00 (2006.01); B24C 3/00 (2006.01); B24C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24C 1/00 (2013.01); B24C 3/00 (2013.01); B24C 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10010012 A1 20000907; EP 1034890 A2 20000913; EP 1034890 A3 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE GAS AG

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI