Global patent index - EP 1034895 A1

EP 1034895 A1 2000-09-13 - Method of placing resiliant rings and tools therefore

Title (en)

Method of placing resiliant rings and tools therefore

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Setzen von elastischen Ringen und Werkzeuge hierfür

Title (fr)

Procédé de pose d'un collier élastique et outillages le mettant en oeuvre

Publication

EP 1034895 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400631 A

Priority

  • FR 9903273 A
  • FR 9911232 A
  • FR 0000915 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns a method and an implementing equipment for fixing an elastic clamp band (1) to the lugs (5) particularly adapted, for example, for recurrent mounting of a flexible connection pipe (12) on a pipe system (13). The invention is characterised in that it comprises an automatic dispenser (2) of clamp bands (1) arranged to position each clamp band (1) such that its two lugs are externally accessible to be seized by the grips (9, 52, 103) of a hand tool for extracting and fixing (8, 50, 100) which are brought together to compress the lugs (5) of the clamp band (1) by external actuating means (11) separately controlled, the tool (8, 50, 100) comprising means for bringing together the grips (9, 52, 103) freely and reversibly when the external actuating means (11) are activated and means for releasing them instantly or gradually at the desired moment with an external control (14, 123).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé et outillages le mettant en oeuvre, pour la pose d'un collier élastique (1) à oreilles (5) particulièrement adapté par exemple au montage répétitif d'une durite (12) sur une canalisation (13) remarquable en ce qu'il comprend un distributeur automatique (2) de colliers (1) agencé pour mettre en position chaque collier (1) de façon que ses deux oreilles (5) soient accessibles de l'extérieur pour être saisies par les mors (9,52,103) d'un outil manuel d'extraction et de pose (8,50,100) dont le rapprochement pour comprimer les oreilles (5) du collier (1) est obtenu par des moyens d'actionnement externes (11) séparément commandés, l'outil (8,50,100) comportant des moyens pour autoriser le rapprochement libre et non réversible des mors (9,52,103) l'un vers l'autre lorsque les moyens d'actionnement externes (11) sont sollicités et des moyens pour les relâcher directement ou progressivement au moment voulu par une commande (14,123) extérieure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23P 11/00 (2006.01); B23P 11/02 (2006.01); B23P 19/04 (2006.01); B23P 21/00 (2006.01); B23Q 7/10 (2006.01); B25B 7/12 (2006.01); B25B 25/00 (2006.01); B25B 27/10 (2006.01); B25B 27/14 (2006.01); F16B 2/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 25/005 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49872 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53313 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53478 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5363 (2013.01); Y10T 29/539 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034895 A1 20000913; AU 3173300 A 20000928; BR 0008803 A 20020409; CA 2362730 A1 20000914; CZ 20013224 A3 20030212; FR 2790696 A1 20000915; FR 2790696 B1 20010427; HU 0200215 A2 20020529; MX PA01009125 A 20030714; PL 354624 A1 20040209; US 6718607 B1 20040413; WO 0053374 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status

2007-10-26 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1030573

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-09-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070327

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010227

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI