Global Patent Index - EP 1034897 A2

EP 1034897 A2 2000-09-13 - Essentially parallelepipedal container

Title (en)

Essentially parallelepipedal container

Title (de)

Im wesentlichen quaderförmiger Behälter

Title (fr)

Récipient sensiblement parallélépipédique

Publication

EP 1034897 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100123 A

Priority

DE 29904057 U

Abstract (en)

An essentially rectangular container esp. tool box has a lid hinged to the rear face. The open box has a rim (30) at the front and rear. Each rim has an inward-projecting edge (28) running the full length of the opening, but below the upper edge (40) of the rim. The edge (28) supports a tray (22) inserted within the box under the main lid (38).

Abstract (de)

Ein im wesentlichen quaderförmiger Behälter weist einen Deckel auf, der an einer Rückwand des Behälters angelenkt ist. Dabei ist mindestens die Oberkante der Seitenwände von Randflanschen des Deckels in geschlossenem Zustand des Deckels überlappt. Insbesondere ist eine umlaufende Dichtung für die Abdichtung zwischen den Seitenwänden und dem Deckel vorgesehen, bei der mindestens zwei einander gegenüberliegende Seitenwände (18, 20) an ihrer Oberkante (25) ein Stützprofil (30) mit einer Auflageschulter (28) aufweisen, auf der je ein Vorsprung (26) eines Einsatzes (22) abstützbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25H 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25H 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25H 3/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29904057 U1 19990520; EP 1034897 A2 20000913; EP 1034897 A3 20020828

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080109

2007-10-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070829

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030210

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FIRMA ZARGES GMBH & CO. KG

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI