Global Patent Index - EP 1034902 A1

EP 1034902 A1 2000-09-13 - Method and device for processing tree trunks

Title (en)

Method and device for processing tree trunks

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zerlegen eines Baumstammes

Title (fr)

Dispositif de traitement des troncs d'arbres

Publication

EP 1034902 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99490008 A

Priority

EP 99490008 A

Abstract (en)

The treatment device is designed to impregnate the fibres of the trunk with the appropriate treatment solution. The device consists of the means (1) of injecting the required solution, under pressure, longitudinally to the cut trunk of the tree, and from one of the ends (2A).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif de traitement des troncs d'arbres coupés, par imprégnation des fibres d'une solution de traitement appropriée, caractérisé par le fait qu'il comporte des moyens d'injection (I) de ladite solution, sous pression, longitudinalement au tronc (2), à partir d'une de ses extrémités frontales (2A, 2'A). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27K 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27K 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27K 3/105 (2013.01); B27K 3/083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034902 A1 20000913

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041216

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI