Global Patent Index - EP 1034906 A2

EP 1034906 A2 2000-09-13 - Process for preparing a building material

Title (en)

Process for preparing a building material

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Anmachung einer Baustoffmischung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la préparation d'un matériau de construction

Publication

EP 1034906 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104942 A

Priority

DE 19911060 A

Abstract (en)

The method and appliance for the continuous mixing of building materials incorporate a feeder (2) conveying the dry or pourable material, a dispenser (3), and a subsequent and preferably continuous mixer chamber (6). The admixture (11) of water is controlled by a regulatable valve or shut-off element (13) connected to the control containing an electronic register or and a programmable calculator unit. The quantity of water fed through the inflow (12) and conveyor is controlled according t the quantity of building material.

Abstract (de)

Zum Anmachen einer trockenen oder rieselfähigen Baustoffmischung mit einer Anmachflüssigkeit wird die Baustoffmischung mengenmäßig dosiert und die hinzuzufügende Menge an Anmachflüssigkeit auf diese dosierte Menge der Baustoffmischung abgestimmt. Dabei wird der Verschleiß einer zum Dosieren der Baustoffmischung dienenden Dosiervorrichtung und damit die Abnahme der Zufuhr der Baustoffmischung abhängig von der Laufzeit und/oder dem Durchsatz dieser Dosiervorrichtung (3) ermittelt und die Zufuhr der Anmachflüssigkeit proportional zu diesem Verschleiß vermindert und/oder die Drehzahl des Antriebsmotors (10) der Dosiervorrichtung (3) proportional zu diesem Verschleiß erhöht, so daß die Baustoffmischung mit einem kontinuierlich arbeitenden oder Durchlaufmischer angemacht und dennoch ein zutreffendes Verhältnis zwischen der Baustoffmischung und der Anmachflüssigkeit erhalten werden können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28C 7/02; B28C 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28C 7/02 (2006.01); B28C 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28C 7/0418 (2013.01); B28C 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034906 A2 20000913; EP 1034906 A3 20010808; EP 1034906 B1 20031112; AT 254018 T 20031115; DE 19911060 A1 20001019; DE 19911060 C2 20010426; ES 2209703 T3 20040701

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160407

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120309

2013-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120308

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120308

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 254018 T

- Effective date: 20120308

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110110

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110322

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110330

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MATHIS TECHNIK G.M.B.H. *M-TEC

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209703 T3

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-05-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031112

2004-05-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004389 P 20031218

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-11-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-07-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 28C 7/02 A, 7B 28C 5/14 B, 7B 28C 7/04 B

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI