Global Patent Index - EP 1034917 A2

EP 1034917 A2 2000-09-13 - Press with locking device for press ram

Title (en)

Press with locking device for press ram

Title (de)

Presse mit einer Verriegelungseinrichtung für Pressenstössel

Title (fr)

Presse avec dispositif de verrouillage pour coulisseau de presse

Publication

EP 1034917 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102302 A

Priority

DE 19910965 A

Abstract (en)

The pressing ram (9) is driven by a drive shaft (8) which is locked by a device which provides a positive-locking or force-locking engagement. When the ram (9) is stationary the external teeth associated with the drive shaft engage with the internal teeth of the locking device mounted on the pressing frame. The drive shaft can have a bush which has or supports the external teeth or a comparable perforated disc.

Abstract (de)

Es wird für Umformmaschinen ein Stößelverriegelungssystem (11) vorgeschlagen, welches eine bezogen auf die Stößellage völlig stufenlose Verriegelung ermöglicht. Aufgrund der gewählten Anordnung kann das System sowohl für Pressen mit einem Stößel (9) als auch für Großteilstufenpressen (1) mit mehreren Stößeln (9) verwendet werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 15/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/287 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034917 A2 20000913; EP 1034917 A3 20011114; DE 19910965 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-09-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI