Global Patent Index - EP 1034927 A1

EP 1034927 A1 2000-09-13 - Quality control device for a sheet printing press

Title (en)

Quality control device for a sheet printing press

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Qualitätskontrolle für eine Bogendruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le controle de la qualité d'une machine à imprimer des feuilles

Publication

EP 1034927 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103781 A

Priority

DE 29904511 U

Abstract (en)

The printer has a delivery system with a delivery stack (3) and a feed surface (5) on which sample sheets from the delivery system are placed. The feed surface is at a height above the delivery stack visible to an average-sized person. The feed surface is at an angle of between 30 and 45 degrees to the horizontal. The feed surface has controls (6,7) for remote-controlled ink dispensing.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Einrichtung zur Qualitätskontrolle für eine Bogendruckmaschine, insbesondere Bogenoffsetdruckmaschine, mit einem einen Auslegerstapel aufweisenden Ausleger und einer dem Ausleger zugeordneten Auflagefläche, auf der dem Ausleger entnommene Probebogen ablegbar sind. Aufgabe der vorliegenden Erfindung ist es, eine solche Einrichtung zur Qualitätskontrolle derartig weiterzubilden, so daß bei geringem bautechnischen Aufwand eine ergonomisch günstige Möglichkeit zur Bogeninspektion vorliegt. Erfindungsgemäß gelingt dies dadurch, daß die Auflagefläche (5) in einer von einer durchschnittlich großen Bedienperson bequem einsehbaren Höhe oberhalb des Auslegerstapels (3) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29904511 U1 19990708; AT 348707 T 20070115; DE 50013873 D1 20070201; EP 1034927 A1 20000913; EP 1034927 B1 20061220; US 6343548 B1 20020205

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-12-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50013873

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110224

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120223

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 348707 T

- Effective date: 20120223

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-06-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50013873

- Effective date: 20120509

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110223

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110223

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110223

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MANROLAND AG

- Free text: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#MUEHLHEIMER STRASSE 341#63075 OFFENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MANROLAND AG#MUEHLHEIMER STRASSE 341#63075 OFFENBACH (DE)

2007-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070921

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Free text: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#MUEHLHEIMER STRASSE 341#63075 OFFENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#MUEHLHEIMER STRASSE 341#63075 OFFENBACH (DE)

2007-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-05-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013873 P 20070201

2007-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2007-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061220

2006-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2006-12-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061220

2004-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040521

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI