Global Patent Index - EP 1034933 A1

EP 1034933 A1 2000-09-13 - An inkjet printer printing responsive to substrate movement

Title (en)

An inkjet printer printing responsive to substrate movement

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldrucker welcher in Abhängigkeit der Bewegung des Substrates druckt

Title (fr)

Imprimante à jet d'encre q'imprime en dépendant du mouvement du substrat

Publication

EP 1034933 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00301493 A

Priority

GB 9905249 A

Abstract (en)

An ink jet printer comprises a path A along which a substrate S to be printed can pass and an array of fixed ink jet heads 12 each having a plurality of nozzles. The array comprises a plurality of rows of ink jet heads 12, each row extending transversely of the path and the rows being spaced apart from one another in the direction of the path. The printer also comprises means for firing the ink jet heads 12 in response to movement of the substrate S which may, for example, be detected by a sensor 20. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/155; B41J 29/393; B41J 29/377

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/51 (2006.01); B41J 13/00 (2006.01); B41J 25/308 (2006.01); B41J 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/51 (2013.01); B41J 13/0072 (2013.01); B41J 25/308 (2013.01); B41J 29/02 (2013.01); B41J 2202/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2343415 A 20000510; GB 2343415 B 20001115; GB 2343415 C 20141022; GB 9905249 D0 19990428; EP 1034933 A1 20000913

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011120

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010312

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI