Global Patent Index - EP 1034995 B1

EP 1034995 B1 2001-12-05 - Cabin for a rope railway

Title (en)

Cabin for a rope railway

Title (de)

Kabine für eine Seilbahnanlage

Title (fr)

Cabine pour un téléphérique

Publication

EP 1034995 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00113989 A

Priority

EP 96890079 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805088A1] At least one support pin (31) projects from the car support assembly (3), passes through the roof (11) of the car in an opening (12), and by its lower free end is fastened to a support plate (32). At least one damping element rests upon the support plate and on the inner side of the car roof. The clear cross section of the opening in the roof exceeds the cross section of the support pin and is preferably twice the size.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 12/02; B61B 12/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/02 (2006.01); B61B 12/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/028 (2013.01); B61B 12/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805088 A1 19971105; EP 0805088 B1 20010816; AT 204238 T 20010915; DE 59607500 D1 20010920; EP 1034995 A1 20000913; EP 1034995 B1 20011205; ES 2159713 T3 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 210036 T

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-05-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59608399

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150601

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150514

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608399 20020117

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 805088

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210036 T 20011215

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001009

2000-09-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 805088

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI