Global patent index - EP 1034996 A1

EP 1034996 A1 2000-09-13 - Departure and arrival station for an aerial cableway with two cables and a cabin for the transport of passengers who board and alight at such a station

Title (en)

Departure and arrival station for an aerial cableway with two cables and a cabin for the transport of passengers who board and alight at such a station

Title (de)

Abfahrts- und Ankunftstation für eine Zweiseilbahn wie auch Kabine zur Beförderung von in einer solchen Station aufzuladenden und abzuladenden Fahrgästen

Title (fr)

Station de départ et d'arrivée pour un téléphérique à deux cables et une cabine pour le transport des passagers qui montent et descendent dans une telle station

Publication

EP 1034996 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99830131 A

Priority

EP 99830131 A

Abstract (en)

The car has a positioning and locking device(4) which as soon as the car is in its end-of-run position engages with guiding and anchoring components(5) installed on the car. Upon approaching the waiting and transit platform(3) the device runs along the guiding and anchoring components and is then anchored in it in such a way that the car is positioned without any effort and locked in its end position in which its front end is adjacent to the waiting and transit platform.

Abstract (de)

Eine Abfahrts- und Ankunftsstation für eine Zweiseilbahn zum Aufladen von zu einer anderen Station zu befördernden Fahrgästen oder zur Abladung zu ihr von einer anderen Station beförderten Fahrgästen durch eine Kabine (2), die auf einem Tragseil (11) gelagert ist und durch einen Zugseil (12) bewegt wird, umfaßt Verankerungsmittel (13) für das Tragseil (11), Zugmittel (14) für das Zugseil (12) und eine Warte- und Durchgangsplattform (3) für die Fahrgäste der Kabine (2). Um zu vermeiden, daß sich die Warte- und Durchgangsplattform längs der Seiten der Kabine (2) erstreckt, umfaßt die Station überdies Positionier- und Mitnahmemittel (4), die sobald die Kabine (2) sich in der Endlaufstellung befindet, an Führungs- und Verankerungskörpern (5) angreifen, die auf der Kabine (2) angeordnet sind, und dann, unter Annäherung an die Warte- und Durchgangsplattform (3), sich anfänglich längs der Führungs- und Verankerungskörper (5) bewegen und nachfolgend in ihnen derart verankern, daß sie die Kabine (2) einwandfrei positionieren und in ihre Endruhestellung mitnehmen, indem ihre vordere Stirnseite (21) der Warte- und Durchgangsplattform (3) angenähert wird. Die Erfindung umfaßt überdies eine Kabine (2) die mit Führungs- und Verankerungskörpern (5) versehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 12/02; B61B 1/02; B61B 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 1/02 (2006.01); B61B 12/00 (2006.01); B61B 12/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/024 (2013.01); B61B 1/02 (2013.01); B61B 12/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034996 A1 20000913; EP 1034996 B1 20020605; AT 218458 T 20020615; ES 2179608 T3 20030116

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100310

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090311

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090311

2010-01-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2009-05-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: INNOVA PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2009-05-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DOPPELMAYR ITALIA SRL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2179608

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR IT LI

2002-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 218458

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-07-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR IT LI

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE LI

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR IT LI

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI