Global Patent Index - EP 1034999 A3

EP 1034999 A3 2000-10-11 - Lower displacement device for sliding sides

Title (en)

Lower displacement device for sliding sides

Title (de)

Untere Ausstellvorrichtung für eine Schiebewand

Title (fr)

Dispositif inférieur de déplacement pour parois coulissantes

Publication

EP 1034999 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00890062 A

Priority

AT 44799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1034999A2] The retraction device has a roller carrier which in the raised position of the parallel linkage engages in a recess in the running rail(5) and aligns with it so that the sliding wall is free to move. In the lowered position the roller carrier lies at a lateral distance away from the running rail, whereby the parallel linkage is held in the lowered position by its own weight and by the weight of the sliding wall in the lowered position, and the sliding wall is fixed in the closed position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 19/00; E05D 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 19/00 (2006.01); B61D 39/00 (2006.01); E05D 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/1068 (2013.01); B61D 19/008 (2013.01); B61D 39/006 (2013.01); E05D 15/1023 (2013.01); E05D 2015/1076 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/51 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1034999 A2 20000913; EP 1034999 A3 20001011; EP 1034999 B1 20040707; AT 407367 B 20010226; AT A44799 A 20000715; DE 50006990 D1 20040812

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170209

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-05-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110501

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-10-21 [REG FR ERR] CORRECTION

- Free text: BOPI DE PUBLICATION Nø: 05/26 PAGES: 273 PARTIE DU BULLETIN CONCERNEE: BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION A ETE REMISE A I'INPI IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE DE LA TRADUCTION EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI.

2005-10-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050408

2004-11-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG

2004-11-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006990 P 20040812

2004-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR IT LI SE

2003-10-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FREIGHT WAGGON WITH A SLIDING SIDE

2003-10-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FREIGHT WAGGON WITH A SLIDING SIDE

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FI FR IT LI SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR IT LI SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI