Global Patent Index - EP 1035029 A1

EP 1035029 A1 2000-09-13 - Tamper-evident means for push-pull closure

Title (en)

Tamper-evident means for push-pull closure

Title (de)

Originalitätssicherung für Zug-Druck-Verschluss

Title (fr)

Dispositif de garantie d'inviolabilité inclus dans les bouchons du type à vaet-vient

Publication

EP 1035029 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00105060 A

Priority

ES 9900619 U

Abstract (en)

Tape (3) is placed around cap (2), rests on fixed section (1) on one side and has superficial boss (5) on other side. Bosses are linking braces with contour (8) of cap that receive peripheral boss (10) on sliding skirt (9) that interlock with ribs (11). That forms impenetrable solid assembly that can only be altered by rotation.

Abstract (fr)

Lesdits bouchons sontconstitués d'une pièce fixe sur laquelle se déplace de façon guidée et entre certaines limites une pièce mobile sous l'effet d'une traction ou d'une poussée. Autour de la pièce mobile (2) est formée, d'une seule pièce avec elle, une bande (3), constituant une jupe périphérique, reposant d'un côté sur la pièce fixe (1), tandis que de l'autre côté elle comporte des saillies superficielles (5) prévues pour constituer sur la même bordure de la bande des points de jonction correspondants réalisant des entretoises de liaison (7) avec le contour (8) de la pièce mobile (2) qui, à son tour, reçoit sur sa jupe coulissante (9) des saillies périphériques (10) qui engrènent avec une succession de nervures (11) prévues à l'intérieur d'une jupe faisant saillie de la pièce fixe (1) pour réaliser un ensemble monobloc impénétrable qui ne peut être altéré que par une rotation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/243 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035029 A1 20000913; ES 1043166 U 19991116; ES 1043166 Y 20001216

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030528

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001107

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI