Global patent index - EP 1035032 A1

EP 1035032 A1 2000-09-13 - Snack package with protective cover

Title (en)

Snack package with protective cover

Title (de)

Verpackung mit Schutzkappe für Snackprodukte

Title (fr)

Emballage comportant un couvercle de protection pour produit alimentaire

Publication

EP 1035032 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99200637 A

Priority

EP 99200637 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a hygienic package suitable for liquid or wet snack food. The package of the invention comprising a sheet of flexible material arranged to form a hermetically closed pouch (2) for the product, the pouch having a first end (20); and a protective member (3) extending from the first end (20), a certain distance along the pouch (2), the protective member surrounding circumferentially the pouch so as to form a protective barrier on the surface of the pouch in the region intended to be opened for releasing the product. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/52; B65B 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/18 (2006.01); B65D 75/52 (2006.01); B65D 75/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/52 (2013.01); B65B 61/184 (2013.01); B65D 75/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035032 A1 20000913

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020615

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020204

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI