Global Patent Index - EP 1035035 A1

EP 1035035 A1 2000-09-13 - Tablet dispenser having a, at least on its inner surface, sustantially cylindrical container

Title (en)

Tablet dispenser having a, at least on its inner surface, sustantially cylindrical container

Title (de)

Tablettenspender mit einem zumindest an der Innenseite im wesentlichen zylindrischen Behälter

Title (fr)

Distributeur de comprimés pourvu d'un récipient ayant une forme, au moins sur sa surface interne, substantiellement cylindrique

Publication

EP 1035035 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103958 A

Priority

DE 19909799 A

Abstract (en)

A tablet dispenser with a cylindrical container (4) for tablets (2), a dispensing mechanism and a delivery ring (10) comprising a closure element (12) which covers the delivery opening (9) of (10), and is movable from this position by operation of the dispensing mechanism, is new. A tablet dispenser with a cylindrical container (4) for tablets (2), a dispensing mechanism and a delivery ring (10) comprising a closure element (12) which covers the delivery opening (9) of (10), and is movable from this position by operation of the dispensing mechanism, is new. At least one stop is provided which fixes the angular position of the rotatable delivery ring so that the position of (9) and the dispenser opening (8) coincide.

Abstract (de)

Ein Tablettenspender (1) mit die Tabletten (2) aufnehmendem zylindrischem Behälter (4) hat eine in seinem Inneren befindliche, ebenfalls im wesentlichen zylindrische Vereinzelungseinrichtung (6) mit Ausgabevorrichtung, wobei im in Spendeposition unteren Bereich des Behälters (4) durch einen Abweiskörper (11) ein ringförmiger Aufnahmeraum (7) gebildet ist, dessen Abmessung etwa der Dicke der Tabletten (2) entspricht. Eine oder bevorzugt mehrere in Umfangsrichtung gleichmäßig verteilte Spendeöffnungen (8) wirken dabei mit einem demgegenüber verdrehbaren, wenigstens eine Ausgabe-Öffnung (9) aufweisenden Ausgabering (10) zusammen, wobei an der Ausgabe-Öffnung (9) ein Verschluß (12) vorgesehen sein kann, der vor der Drehbewegung zunächst eine axiale Verstellbewegung zum Öffnen dieses Verschlusses (12) erforderlich macht, so daß der Inhalt des Behälters (4) gegen Staubzutritt geschützt ist. Die axiale Verstellbewegung kann gleichzeitig zur Entriegelung einer Sperrung der zum Spenden erforderlichen Drehbewegung gegenüber dem Behälter (4) zu lösen, wobei diese Axialbewegung zumindest in ihrem letzten Bereich für eine Kindersicherung gegen einen erhöhten, eine Rückstellkraft bildenden Widerstand erfolgen kann, so daß die Drehbewegung unter ständiger Aufrechterhaltung einer Zugkraft an seinem entsprechenden Betätigungsring (13) durchzuführen ist, andernfalls die Verriegelung der Verdrehbarkeit wieder selbsttätig erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/0409 (2013.01); B65D 2215/02 (2013.01); B65D 2215/04 (2013.01); B65D 2583/0495 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4228920 A 19801021 - BURTON GEORGE W

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035035 A1 20000913; DE 19909799 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-03 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020510

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI