Global Patent Index - EP 1035036 A1

EP 1035036 A1 2000-09-13 - Tablet dispenser having a rotatable dispensing ring

Title (en)

Tablet dispenser having a rotatable dispensing ring

Title (de)

Tablettenspender mit einem verdrehbaren Ausgabering

Title (fr)

Distributeur de comprimés pourvu d'un anneau de distribution rotatif

Publication

EP 1035036 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103959 A

Priority

DE 19909798 A

Abstract (en)

The tablet dispenser with a cylindrical container (4) comprises an operating ring (13) for rotation of the delivery ring (10). In its rest position the operating ring is not rotatable relative to the container, and must be first unlocked or axially displaced relative to the container. At least during a part of its unlocking or axial displacement process it must be moved against a resisting force.

Abstract (de)

Ein Tablettenspender (1) mit die Tabletten (2) aufnehmendem zylindrischem Behälter (4) hat eine in seinem Inneren befindliche, ebenfalls im wesentlichen zylindrische Vereinzelungseinrichtung (6) mit Ausgabevorrichtung, wobei im in Spendeposition unteren Bereich des Behälters (4) durch einen Abweiskörper (11) ein ringförmiger Aufnahmeraum (7) gebildet ist, dessen Abmessung etwa der Dicke der Tabletten (2) entspricht. Eine oder bevorzugt mehrere in Umfangsrichtung gleichmäßig verteilte Spendeöffnungen (8) wirken dabei mit einem demgegenüber verdrehbaren, wenigstens eine Ausgabe-Öffnung (9) aufweisenden Ausgabering (10) zusammen, wobei an der Ausgabe-Öffnung (9) ein Verschluß (12) vorgesehen sein kann, der vor der Drehbewegung zunächst eine axiale Verstellbewegung zum Öffnen dieses Verschlusses (12) erforderlich macht, so daß der Inhalt des Behälters (4) gegen Staubzutritt geschützt ist. Die axiale Verstellbewegung kann gleichzeitig zur Entriegelung einer Sperrung der zum Spenden erforderlichen Drehbewegung gegenüber dem Behälter (4) zu lösen, wobei diese Axialbewegung zumindest in ihrem letzten Bereich für eine Kindersicherung gegen einen erhöhten, eine Rückstellkraft bildenden Widerstand erfolgen kann, so daß die Drehbewegung unter ständiger Aufrechterhaltung einer Zugkraft an seinem entsprechenden Betätigungsring (13) durchzuführen ist, andernfalls die Verriegelung der Verdrehbarkeit wieder selbsttätig erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/0409 (2013.01); B65D 2215/02 (2013.01); B65D 2215/04 (2013.01); B65D 2583/0495 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4228920 A 19801021 - BURTON GEORGE W

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035036 A1 20000913; EP 1035036 B1 20030528; DE 19909798 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160225

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160225

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002317

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141231

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150227

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002317 P 20030703

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RISDON PHARMA GMBH

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011207

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI