Global patent index - EP 1035037 A2

EP 1035037 A2 2000-09-13 - A cap for an aerosol

Title (en)

A cap for an aerosol

Title (de)

Kappe für eine Aerosoldose

Title (fr)

Capuchon pour une bombe aérosol

Publication

EP 1035037 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104917 A

Priority

DE 29904392 U

Abstract (en)

The protective plastics cap has a second nose (3) by which the cap is movable up and down but remains fixed on the can. The cap can be moved up over the nose fixing point only by a corresponding force application. The limiting of the axial movement travel of the cap in the downwards direction is effected either by an additional encircling or broken rib on the inner cap surface or through the height of the opening collar which sits in the valve disc.

Abstract (de)

Für eine Sprühdosenanordnung mit einer über einem Dosendeckel angeordneten Schutzkappe wird vorgeschlagen, die Schutzkappe oder zumindest einen Teil derselben reversibel zwischen einer Arbeitsposition und einer Ruheposition verschiebbar zu gestalten, wobei in der Arbeitsposition der Sprühkopf durch die Schutzkappe geschützt ist und in der Arbeitsposition der Sprühkopf frei liegt. Die Kappe ist sowohl in der Arbeitsposition als auch in der Ruheposition und bei der Verschiebung zwischen diesen Positionen immer mit der Dose verbunden, so daß auch ein Verlust der Kappe nicht zu befürchten ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/14 (2006.01); B65D 83/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/40 (2013.01); B65D 83/205 (2013.01); B65D 2251/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29904392 U1 19990701; EP 1035037 A2 20000913; EP 1035037 A3 20001220

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI