Global Patent Index - EP 1035042 A1

EP 1035042 A1 2000-09-13 - Refuse receptacle with lid and accessory storage device

Title (en)

Refuse receptacle with lid and accessory storage device

Title (de)

Müllbehälter mit Deckel und Zubehörmagazin

Title (fr)

Poubelle à couvercle et à rangement d'accessoires

Publication

EP 1035042 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00410019 A

Priority

FR 9903028 A

Abstract (en)

Bin (10) comprises waste container (12), frame (14) placed on upper edge of container, and lid (18). Cavity (32) is placed in frame and has semi-cylindrical shape. Roll of spare bin bags or other accessories can be stored inside this cavity. Flap lid (38) is placed in lid to allow access to waste container without opening lid (18).

Abstract (fr)

Une poubelle 10 en matière plastique moulée, comprend un bac 12 de réception des déchets, un cadre 14 support à rebord 24 incurvé rapporté sur le bord supérieur 16 ouvert du bac, et un couvercle 18 de fermeture. Le cadre 14 comporte des moyens d'articulation du couvercle 18, et une cavité 32 conformée selon une goulotte de rangement d'un accessoire, l'accès à ladite cavité étant inhibé en position fermée du couvercle 18. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/06; B65F 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/06 (2006.01); B65F 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/1607 (2013.01); B65F 1/06 (2013.01); B65F 1/062 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 9319459 U1 19950413 - DIEFENBACH BERNDT [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035042 A1 20000913; EP 1035042 B1 20020731; DE 60000295 D1 20020905; DE 60000295 T2 20030327; ES 2180502 T3 20030216; FR 2790746 A1 20000915; FR 2790746 B1 20010608

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALLIBERT

- Effective date: 20050331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALLIBERT

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050331

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-05-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040519

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-03-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040318

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-03-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040311

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-03-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2004-02-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040225

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *ALLIBERT

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-12-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-09-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180502 T3

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021202

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000295 20020905

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-06-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI