Global Patent Index - EP 1035053 A2

EP 1035053 A2 2000-09-13 - Method for winding a material web and winding machine to perform the method

Title (en)

Method for winding a material web and winding machine to perform the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn sowie Wickelmaschine zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méthode pour bobiner une bande de matériau et bobineuse pour réaliser cette méthode

Publication

EP 1035053 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125191 A

Priority

DE 19910567 A

Abstract (en)

The process for winding a paper or cardboard web comprises feeding it over a carrier roller and forming a nip between this and a drum. The web is cut into sections by cutters (28, 28') which move transversely across the direction in which the web is being wound and transferred to a new, empty drum when the first becomes full. An Independent claim is included for a winding machine for carrying out the process.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Wickelmaschine 10 zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn 12 wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn wird die Materialbahn 12 über eine Tragtrommel 20 geführt und zwischen der Tragtrommel 20 und dem Tambour 14, 14' ein Nip 22 gebildet und die Materialbahn 12 für einen jeweiligen Tambourwechsel durchtrennt. Die Materialbahn 12 wird in mehreren quer zur Bahnlaufrichtung L aufeinanderfolgenden Teilabschnitten mittels getrennter, jeweils nur einem Teilabschnitt zugeordneter allgemein in Querrichtung verfahrbarer Trennelemente jeweils so geschnitten, daß in jedem Teilabschnitt jeweils ein auf den neuen, noch leeren Tambour aufführbarer Bahnanfang gebildet wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/26; B65H 19/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/26 (2006.01); B65H 19/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/28 (2013.01); B65H 19/265 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035053 A2 20000913; EP 1035053 A3 20010912; EP 1035053 B1 20040707; AT 270647 T 20040715; DE 19910567 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111217

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 270647

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20111217

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111218

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59909908

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111217

2012-07-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050408

2004-08-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909908

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2002-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020312

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI