Global patent index - EP 1035054 A2

EP 1035054 A2 2000-09-13 - Method for winding a material web and winding machine to perform the method

Title (en)

Method for winding a material web and winding machine to perform the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn sowie Wickelmaschine zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méthode pour bobiner une bande de matériau et bobineuse pour réaliser cette méthode

Publication

EP 1035054 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125193 A

Priority

DE 19910566 A

Abstract (en)

The process for winding a paper or cardboard web (12) comprises feeding it over a carrier roller and forming a nip between this and a drum. When the drum is full, the web is cut by cutters (26) which begin cutting near the edges of the web and move towards the middle where the cuts meet. The web is then transferred to a new, empty drum. An Independent claim is included for a winding machine for carrying out the process.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Wickelmaschine 10 zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn 12, wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn, wird die Materialbahn 12 über eine Tragtrommel 20 geführt und zwischen der Tragtrommel 20 und dem Tambour 14, 14' ein Wickelspalt 22 gebildet und die Materialbahn 12 wird für einen jeweiligen Tambourwechsel durchtrennt. Die Materialbahn 12 wird mittels zweier allgemein quer zur Bahnlaufrichtung L verfahrbarer Trennelemente 26 geschnitten, indem die beiden Trennelemente 26 im Bereich der beiden Bahnränder zur Bildung eines Streifens 28 im Abstand vom jeweiligen Bahnrand angesetzt und anschließend bei laufender Materialbahn 12 zumindest bis zur Bahnmitte verfahren werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/265 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5151 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51534 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51536 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035054 A2 20000913; EP 1035054 A3 20020109; EP 1035054 B1 20040414; AT 264253 T 20040415; CA 2300325 A1 20000910; CA 2300325 C 20080122; DE 19910566 A1 20000914; US 6467720 B1 20021022

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131217

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59909177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-08-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131217

2014-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 264253

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20131217

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59909177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121212

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121212

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-07-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI