Global Patent Index - EP 1035055 A2

EP 1035055 A2 2000-09-13 - Method for winding a material web and winding machine to perform the method

Title (en)

Method for winding a material web and winding machine to perform the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn sowie Wickelmaschine zum Durchführen des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méthode pour bobiner une bande de matériau et bobineuse pour réaliser cette méthode

Publication

EP 1035055 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125194 A

Priority

DE 19910570 A

Abstract (en)

The process for winding a paper or cardboard web (12) comprises feeding it over a carrier roller and forming a nip between this and a drum. When the drum is full, the web is cut by cutters (36, 38) which cut a portion (II) of the web after which the remaining portion (III) is torn. The web is then transferred to a new, empty drum. An Independent claim is included for a winding machine for carrying out the process.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Wickelmaschine 10 zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn 12 wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn auf einen Tambour 14, 14' wird die Materialbahn 12 über eine Tragtrommel 20 geführt und zwischen der Tragtrommel 20 und dem Tambour 14, 14' ein Wickelspalt 22 gebildet. Für einen jeweiligen Tambourwechsel wird die Materialbahn 12 durchtrennt. Dabei ist wenigstens ein allgemein quer zur Bahnlaufrichtung L verfahrbares Schneidelement 36, 38 über eine Steuer- und/oder Regeleinrichtung 40 so beaufschlagbar, daß die Materialbahn 12 mittels dieses Schneidelements 36, 38 lediglich über einen Teil der Bahnbreite durchtrennt wird. Anschließend wird wenigstens ein verbleibender Teil der Materialbahn 12 abgerissen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/267 (2013.01); B65H 19/265 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5151 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035055 A2 20000913; EP 1035055 A3 20020109; EP 1035055 B1 20040414; AT 264254 T 20040415; DE 19910570 A1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091218

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091217

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091217

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-07-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909178

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI