Global Patent Index - EP 1035056 A2

EP 1035056 A2 2000-09-13 - Method for winding a material web and winding machine to perform the method

Title (en)

Method for winding a material web and winding machine to perform the method

Title (de)

Verfahren und Wickelmaschine zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Méthode pour bobiner une bande de matériau et bobineuse pour réaliser cette méthode

Publication

EP 1035056 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125198 A

Priority

DE 19910569 A

Abstract (en)

The process for winding a paper or cardboard web (12) comprises feeding it over a carrier roller and forming a nip (22) between this and a drum (20). When the drum is full, the web is cut by a non-contact cutting device (24), e.g. a jet of water or air or a laser. A separating device (26) then separates the web into two and the web is transferred to a new drum. An Independent claim is included for a winding machine for carrying out the process.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Wickelmaschine (10) zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn (12) wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn auf einen Tambour (14, 14') wird die Materialbahn (12) über eine Tragtrommel (20) geführt und zwischen der Tragtrommel (20) und dem Tambour (14, 14') ein Wickelspalt (22) gebildet. Die Materialbahn (12) wird für einen jeweiligen Tambourwechsel durchtrennt, indem mittels wenigstens einer berührungslos arbeitenden Schneideinrichtung (24) ein insbesondere spitzer neuer Bahnanfang geschnitten wird. Zum Durchtrennen der Materialbahn (12) ist zusätzlich wenigstens ein Trennelement (26) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/26 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41417 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5152 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51533 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51534 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51536 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01); B65H 2801/84 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035056 A2 20000913; EP 1035056 A3 20020109; EP 1035056 B1 20040414; AT 264255 T 20040415; DE 19910569 A1 20001012; US 6364240 B1 20020402

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909179

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101218

2011-09-13 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101217

2011-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101217

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091217

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20091215

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909179 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI