Global Patent Index - EP 1035057 A2

EP 1035057 A2 2000-09-13 - Sheet processing method

Title (en)

Sheet processing method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bearbeiten von Bogen

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement de feuilles

Publication

EP 1035057 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112004 A

Priority

  • DE 19643409 A
  • DE 19653403 A
  • EP 97945759 A

Abstract (en)

The sheets are fed in line into the processing machine where a first cutting cylinder (21) trims off the trailing edge of each sheet. The sheets then pass a first inspection station (4) and are rotated so that the freshly cut edge leads. This provides a second trim for the new trailing edge, using a second cutting cylinder (57) followed by a second inspection station (6). The sheets are trimmed longitudinally after the first cross cut and the two streams are transported in parallel. The parallel feeds also pass a second edge trim which sets the width of the sheets.

Abstract (de)

Der Bedruckstoff (2,82,83) wird zuerst be- oder zerschnitten. Anschließend wird das Schnittregister mittels einer Inspektionseinrichtung (3,4,6) kontrolliert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/02; B65H 5/08; B65H 5/12; B65H 29/04; B65H 29/06; B65H 35/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/12 (2006.01); B26D 1/00 (2006.01); B65H 5/08 (2006.01); B65H 5/12 (2006.01); B65H 15/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/04 (2006.01); B65H 29/06 (2006.01); B65H 29/60 (2006.01); B65H 31/24 (2006.01); B65H 35/02 (2006.01); B65H 35/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/24 (2013.01); B41F 33/0036 (2013.01); B65H 29/041 (2013.01); B65H 35/02 (2013.01); B65H 35/08 (2013.01); B65H 2301/351 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42172 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2511/242 (2013.01); B65H 2511/512 (2013.01); B65H 2553/41 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1912 (2013.01); Y10T 83/2024 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6129468 A 20001010; BR 9712992 A 20000418; CN 1075787 C 20011205; CN 1238734 A 19991215; DE 19653403 A1 19980430; DE 19653403 C2 20010510; DE 59704255 D1 20010913; DE 59708846 D1 20030109; EP 0932570 A1 19990804; EP 0932570 B1 20010808; EP 1035057 A2 20000913; EP 1035057 A3 20000920; EP 1035057 B1 20021127; JP 2000508285 A 20000704; JP 3174071 B2 20010611; US 6257139 B1 20010710; WO 9817562 A1 19980430

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081016

2009-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071017

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051016

2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-10-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051017

2005-10-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051016

2004-10-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041020

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040928

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708846 20030109

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 932570

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011029

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-09-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 932570

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE