Global Patent Index - EP 1035057 A3

EP 1035057 A3 2000-09-20 - Sheet processing method

Title (en)

Sheet processing method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bearbeiten von Bogen

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement de feuilles

Publication

EP 1035057 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00112004 A

Priority

  • DE 19643409 A
  • DE 19653403 A
  • EP 97945759 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6129468A] PCT No. PCT/DE97/02394 Sec. 371 Date Apr. 21, 1999 Sec. 102(e) Date Apr. 21, 1999 PCT Filed Oct. 16, 1997 PCT Pub. No. WO98/17562 PCT Pub. Date Apr. 30, 1998Printed sheets are fed into a sheet processing machine where they are separated into partial sheets by being cut longitudinally. The partial sheets are separated laterally from each other by gripper components. Each of the partial sheets can have its leading and trailing ends cut. The cut partial sheets can then be inspected and deposited into a selected one of a plurality of partial sheet stacks.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/02; B65H 5/08; B65H 5/12; B65H 29/04; B65H 29/06; B65H 35/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/12 (2006.01); B26D 1/00 (2006.01); B65H 5/08 (2006.01); B65H 5/12 (2006.01); B65H 15/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/04 (2006.01); B65H 29/06 (2006.01); B65H 29/60 (2006.01); B65H 31/24 (2006.01); B65H 35/02 (2006.01); B65H 35/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/24 (2013.01); B41F 33/0036 (2013.01); B65H 29/041 (2013.01); B65H 35/02 (2013.01); B65H 35/08 (2013.01); B65H 2301/351 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42172 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2511/242 (2013.01); B65H 2511/512 (2013.01); B65H 2553/41 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1912 (2013.01); Y10T 83/2024 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6129468 A 20001010; BR 9712992 A 20000418; CN 1075787 C 20011205; CN 1238734 A 19991215; DE 19653403 A1 19980430; DE 19653403 C2 20010510; DE 59704255 D1 20010913; DE 59708846 D1 20030109; EP 0932570 A1 19990804; EP 0932570 B1 20010808; EP 1035057 A2 20000913; EP 1035057 A3 20000920; EP 1035057 B1 20021127; JP 2000508285 A 20000704; JP 3174071 B2 20010611; US 6257139 B1 20010710; WO 9817562 A1 19980430

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081016

2009-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071017

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051016

2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-10-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051017

2005-10-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051016

2004-10-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041020

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040928

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708846 20030109

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 932570

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011029

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-09-13 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 932570

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE