Global Patent Index - EP 1035058 A2

EP 1035058 A2 2000-09-13 - Device for forming a start bunch in an automatic winder

Title (en)

Device for forming a start bunch in an automatic winder

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Bildung eines Anfangbündels in einem Spulautomat

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour former un enroulement de démarrage dans un bobinoir automatique

Publication

EP 1035058 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00103092 A

Priority

JP 6109699 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a doffing device of an automatic winder comprising a pair of winding-start bunch formation devices B1, B2 disposed therein for changing a position at which a winding-start bunch y1 is formed depending on a direction in which a rewound yarn has been twisted, that is, whether the yarn has been subjected to S or Z twisting. The position of the bunch can be changed depending on whether the yarn has been twisted in the S or Z direction. Consequently, when the yarn is drawn out upward from a winding package formed by the automatic winder, the drawing-out can be carried out in the direction in which the yarn is untwisted. As a result, possible snarl or kink in the unwound yarn is restrained to enable the yarn to be unwound in the form of a well-defined balloon, thereby reducing the occurrence of yarn breakage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/34 (2006.01); B65H 67/04 (2006.01); B65H 67/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/34 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035058 A2 20000913; EP 1035058 A3 20010704; EP 1035058 B1 20040519; DE 60010780 D1 20040624; DE 60010780 T2 20050616; JP 2000255901 A 20000919; JP 3750401 B2 20060301

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60010780

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN, DE

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60010780

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080215

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60010780

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE IT

2002-02-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011217

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI