Global patent index - EP 1035062 A3

EP 1035062 A3 2001-01-17 - Winder mandrel

Title (en)

Winder mandrel

Title (de)

Rotierbares Tragelement

Title (fr)

Mandrin de bobinage

Publication

EP 1035062 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00104864 A

Priority

DE 19910475 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1035062A2] The casing(3) around the body of the rotatable support element has a relief section(7) extending around its circumference and which is formed by an area of lesser material thickness or by a material-free area. The area of reduced material thickness is formed by an outwards opened annular slot. The relief area is at least partially filled with a flexible substance(10) which may be dyed for identification purposes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/243 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035062 A2 20000913; EP 1035062 A3 20010117; DE 19910475 A1 20001012; DE 19910475 C2 20010613; US 6454204 B1 20020924

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI