Global patent index - EP 1035063 A1

EP 1035063 A1 2000-09-13 - Chuck device for winding core

Title (en)

Chuck device for winding core

Title (de)

Spannvorrichtung für Wickelkern

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage pour noyau de bobinage

Publication

EP 1035063 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99103923 A

Priority

EP 99103923 A

Abstract (en)

A chuck device (1) for a winding core (C) comprising a collar proper (3) around which to externally insert the core at its hollow side; an annular ring (5) rotatably fitted on an outer periphery of the collar proper; and rotation transmitting means (9), formed on the annular ring, for forcingly supporting the inner surface of the core to transmit the rotation drive of a rotary shaft (2) from the collar proper to the core, characterized in that a plurality of wheel-like rotors (12,12a) and forcing abutment means (11,13,14) for energizing and forcingly abutting each of the rotors toward the inner face of the core are provided in the outer periphery of the ring and the rotors are rendered rotatable only in the axial direction of the ring. Thus, engagement force of the ring to the core upon initial actuation is ensured, and the insertion and removal operation of the core is facilitated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/247 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 9113939 U1 19920102
  • [A] FR 2198484 A5 19740329 - DIOCE GLASER INC [US]
  • [AD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 17, no. 288 (M - 1423) 3 June 1993 (1993-06-03)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 315 (M - 735)<3162> 26 August 1988 (1988-08-26)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1035063 A1 20000913; EP 1035063 B1 20050216; DE 69923760 D1 20050324; DE 69923760 T2 20060105

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160317

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-04-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69923760

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2005-02-16 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-02-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-02-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050216

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040322

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT NL

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI